Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/28/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 10/28/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/28/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/01/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/01/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/01/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/01/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/01/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/01/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/01/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/01/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/01/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/01/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/05/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/05/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 11/05/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/05/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/05/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/05/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/09/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/09/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/09/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/15/1999