Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/03/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/03/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/03/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/03/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/03/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 11/03/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/03/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/03/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/04/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/04/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/08/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/08/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/09/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/10/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/10/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/10/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/10/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/10/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/15/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/15/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/15/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/15/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/15/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/15/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/16/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/16/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/16/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 11/16/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/17/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/17/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/17/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/18/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/18/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/18/1999