Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/09/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/09/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/09/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/09/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/09/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/14/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/06/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/06/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/06/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/20/2000