Text: H.Con.Res.235 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Agreed to House (11/18/1999)

 
[Congressional Bills 106th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 235 Agreed to House (ATH)]

  1st Session
H. CON. RES. 235

Providing for the sine die adjournment of the first session of the One 
                        Hundred Sixth Congress.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           November 18, 1999

  Mr. Armey submitted the following concurrent resolution; which was 
                        considered and agreed to

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
Providing for the sine die adjournment of the first session of the One 
                        Hundred Sixth Congress.

    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, 
November 18, 1999, through Monday, November 22, 1999, on a motion 
offered pursuant to this concurrent resolution by its Majority Leader 
or his designee, it shall stand adjourned until noon on Thursday, 
December 2, 1999 (unless it sooner has received a message from the 
Senate transmitting its concurrence in the conference report to 
accompany H.R. 3194, in which case the House shall stand adjourned sine 
die), or until noon on the second day after Members are notified to 
reassemble pursuant to section 3 of this concurrent resolution; and 
that when the Senate adjourns on any day from Thursday, November 18, 
1999, through Thursday, December 2, 1999, on a motion offered pursuant 
to this concurrent resolution by its Majority Leader or his designee, 
it shall stand adjourned sine die, or until noon on the second day 
after Members are notified to reassemble pursuant to section 3 of this 
concurrent resolution.
    Sec. 2. When the House convenes for the second session of the One 
Hundred Sixth Congress, it shall conduct no organizational or 
legislative business on that day and, when the House adjourns on that 
day, it shall stand adjourned until noon on January 27, 2000, or until 
noon on the second day after Members are notified to reassemble 
pursuant to section 3 of this concurrent resolution.
    Sec. 3. The Speaker of the House and the Majority Leader of the 
Senate, acting jointly after consultation with the Minority Leader of 
the House and the Minority Leader of the Senate, shall notify the 
Members of the House and Senate, respectively, to reassemble whenever, 
in their opinion, the public interest shall warrant it.
    Sec. 4. The Congress declares that clause 2(h) of rule II of the 
Rules of the House of Representatives and the order of the Senate of 
January 6, 1999, authorize for the duration of the One Hundred Sixth 
Congress the Clerk of the House of Representatives and the Secretary of 
the Senate, respectively, to receive messages from the President during 
periods when the House and Senate are not in session, and thereby 
preserve until adjournment sine die of the final regular session of the 
One Hundred Sixth Congress the constitutional prerogative of the House 
and Senate to reconsider vetoed measures in light of the objections of 
the President, since the availability of the Clerk and the Secretary 
during any earlier adjournment of either House during the current 
Congress does not prevent the return by the President of any bill 
presented to him for approval.
    Sec. 5. The Clerk of the House of Representatives shall inform the 
President of the United States of the adoption of this concurrent 
resolution.

            Passed the House of Representatives November 18, 1999.

                                 <all>

Share This