Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/24/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/24/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/27/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/27/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 01/27/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 01/27/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/27/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/27/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/31/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/31/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/31/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/31/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 01/31/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 01/31/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/31/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/31/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/31/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/31/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 01/31/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/31/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/31/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/31/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 01/31/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/31/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/31/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/01/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/01/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/01/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/03/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/03/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/03/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/15/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/29/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/06/2000