Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/01/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/01/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/01/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/01/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/01/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/01/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 03/01/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/01/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/14/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/14/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/21/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/21/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/23/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/29/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/30/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/30/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/06/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/06/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/06/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/06/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/06/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/06/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/06/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/06/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/06/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/06/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/06/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/06/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/13/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/13/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/04/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/04/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/04/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/04/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/04/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/11/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/11/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/11/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/19/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/19/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/19/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/19/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/13/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/15/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/26/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/26/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/13/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/21/2000