Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/16/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/01/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/08/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/09/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/09/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/09/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/09/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/09/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/14/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/16/2000
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/23/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/29/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/25/2000