Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/29/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/29/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/29/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/25/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/25/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/25/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/25/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/25/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/25/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/25/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/23/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/23/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/23/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/23/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/23/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/23/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/26/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/26/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/27/2000