Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/02/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/02/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/02/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/02/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/08/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/08/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 03/08/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/08/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/08/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/08/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/08/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/08/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/08/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/08/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/08/2000
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/08/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/08/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/08/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/15/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/15/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/15/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/15/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/15/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/21/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/21/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/28/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/28/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 03/28/2000