Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/06/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/06/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/06/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/06/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/21/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/21/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/21/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/21/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/21/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/21/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/21/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/21/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/21/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/21/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/28/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/28/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/28/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/28/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/28/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/04/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/04/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/04/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/04/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/03/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/03/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/03/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/03/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/11/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/13/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/13/2000