Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/14/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/14/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/14/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/14/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/15/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/15/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/15/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/15/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/15/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/16/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/20/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/28/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/13/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/14/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/20/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/20/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/26/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/26/2000