Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/15/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/15/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/16/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/16/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/22/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/22/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/03/2000