Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/21/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/21/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/23/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/28/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/04/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/06/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/03/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/03/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/03/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/03/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/10/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/10/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/23/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/06/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/21/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/21/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/21/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/07/2000