Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/10/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/10/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/11/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/11/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/23/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/23/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/23/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/25/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/25/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/25/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/25/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/03/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/03/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/09/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/09/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/09/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/09/1999