There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To express the sense of the Congress that any Executive order that infringes on the powers and duties of the Congress under article I, section 8 of the Constitution, or that would require the expenditure of Federal funds not specifically appropriated for the purpose of the Executive order, is advisory only and has no force or effect unless enacted as law.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/10/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
10/28/1999Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law
10/13/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/19/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5757)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1603)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H962)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/1999Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (84)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/12/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/12/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/12/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/12/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 02/12/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/23/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/23/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 02/23/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/02/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/02/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/02/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/11/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/11/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/23/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/23/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/24/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/12/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/14/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/15/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/27/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 04/29/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/06/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/18/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/18/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/08/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/17/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/15/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 08/02/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/09/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/22/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/23/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/14/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 11/09/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/22/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/10/1999 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law10/13/1999 Referred to
10/28/1999 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.30. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/10/1999)

Expresses the sense of Congress that any Executive order issued by the President before, on, or after the date of the approval of this resolution that infringes on the powers and duties of the Congress under article I, section 8 of the Constitution (Powers of Congress), or that would require the expenditure of Federal funds not specifically appropriated for the purpose of the Executive order, is advisory only and has no force or effect unless enacted as law.