Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/10/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/12/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/12/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/12/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/12/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 02/12/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/23/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/23/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 02/23/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/02/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/02/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/02/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/11/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/11/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/23/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/23/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/24/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/12/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/14/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/15/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/27/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 04/29/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/06/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/18/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/18/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/08/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/17/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/15/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 08/02/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/09/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/22/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/23/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/14/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 11/09/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/22/2000