There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress that the presence of brain wave activity and spontaneous cardiac activity should be considered conclusive evidence of human life for legal purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/12/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/12/2000Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (121)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/13/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/13/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/13/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/13/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/13/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/19/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/19/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/23/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/23/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/23/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/23/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/23/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/23/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/23/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/23/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/23/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/23/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/23/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/11/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/11/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/11/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/11/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/11/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/11/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/27/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/12/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.305.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.305. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/12/2000)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that: (1) the presence of brain activity and spontaneous cardiac activity should be considered conclusive evidence for all legal purposes of the presence of human life, without regard to age, health, defects, or condition of dependency; (2) the absence of such activity, other than an irreversible cessation of these activities, should not be considered conclusive evidence for legal purposes that a human life is not present; and (3) the Constitution protects all human life in the United States.