Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/13/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/13/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/13/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/13/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/13/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/19/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/19/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/23/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/23/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/23/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/23/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/23/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/23/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/23/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/23/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/23/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/23/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/23/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/11/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/11/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/11/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/11/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/11/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/11/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/27/2000