Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/23/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/23/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/23/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/23/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/23/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/23/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/23/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/23/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/23/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/23/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/23/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/23/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/23/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/23/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/23/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/23/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/23/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/23/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/23/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/23/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/23/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/23/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/25/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/25/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/25/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/25/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/25/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/25/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/25/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/25/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/25/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/06/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/06/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/06/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/21/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/21/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/21/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/21/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/21/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/21/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/21/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/21/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/21/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/11/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/11/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/11/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/11/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/11/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/11/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/11/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/11/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/11/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/11/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/11/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/11/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/11/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/25/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/25/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/25/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/25/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/25/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/25/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/25/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/25/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/25/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/06/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/06/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/14/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/14/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/14/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/30/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/30/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/30/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/30/2000