Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/15/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/15/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/17/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/17/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/17/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/17/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/17/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/17/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/17/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/17/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/17/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/17/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/17/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/17/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/23/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/23/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/23/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/23/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/23/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/23/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/23/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/23/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/23/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/08/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/08/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/08/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/08/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/08/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/08/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/08/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/20/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/20/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/26/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/26/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/26/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/26/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/11/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/11/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/11/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/27/2000