Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/02/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/16/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/16/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/19/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/22/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/25/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/25/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/06/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/07/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/07/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/08/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/08/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/08/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/13/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/13/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/20/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/21/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/22/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/23/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/12/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/12/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/12/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/12/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/12/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/12/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/19/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/06/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/26/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/26/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/26/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/28/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/02/2000