Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/13/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/13/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/13/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/13/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/13/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/13/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/14/2000