There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Urging increased Federal funding for juvenile (Type 1) diabetes research.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/10/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/15/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
05/10/2000Referred to the House Committee on Commerce. (text of measure as introduced: CR E687)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2000Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E687)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (108)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 05/10/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/10/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/19/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/19/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/19/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/19/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/19/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/19/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/19/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/19/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/19/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/19/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/19/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/19/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/19/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/23/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/23/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/23/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/07/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/07/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/07/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/07/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/07/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/07/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/07/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/07/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/07/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/07/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/09/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/09/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/12/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/12/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/12/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/12/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/12/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/12/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/19/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/19/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/19/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/19/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/21/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/21/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/21/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/21/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/21/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/28/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/28/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/28/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/28/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/28/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/11/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/11/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/11/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/11/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/11/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/11/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/18/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/18/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/18/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/24/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/24/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/24/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/18/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce05/10/2000 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment05/15/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.321.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.321. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/10/2000)

Declares that Federal funding for diabetes research should be increased in accordance with the recommendations of the Diabetes Research Working Group so that a cure for juvenile diabetes can be found.