Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/19/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/19/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/07/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/12/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/21/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/11/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/24/2000