Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/19/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/19/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/07/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/19/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/21/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/28/2000