Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/19/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/07/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/12/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/11/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/11/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/24/2000