Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 05/10/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/10/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/23/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/23/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/23/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/07/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/07/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/07/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/28/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/11/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/18/2000