Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/16/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 05/16/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/16/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/16/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/16/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/07/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/07/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/07/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/15/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/15/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/15/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/15/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/15/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/15/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/27/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/27/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/10/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/10/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/10/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/10/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/13/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/20/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/20/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/20/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/20/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/20/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/20/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/20/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/20/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/20/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/20/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/20/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/20/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/20/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/20/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/24/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/27/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/12/2000