Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/16/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/15/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/15/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/27/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/10/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/20/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/20/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/20/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/20/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/20/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/20/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/27/2000