Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/16/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/16/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/07/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/07/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/15/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/15/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/15/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/27/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/10/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/10/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/20/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/20/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/20/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/20/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/20/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/24/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/12/2000