Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/07/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/26/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/27/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/03/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/03/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/04/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/06/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/06/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/11/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/12/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/12/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/18/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/18/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/18/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/18/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/18/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/18/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/19/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/19/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/19/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/24/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/24/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/25/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/25/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/25/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/25/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/25/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/27/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/27/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 10/27/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/30/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/01/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 12/04/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/04/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/04/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/07/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 12/15/2000