Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/06/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/06/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/12/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/12/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/12/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/13/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/18/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/18/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/19/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/12/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/18/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/18/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/25/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 10/02/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/02/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/05/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/05/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/12/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/12/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/12/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/17/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/14/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/14/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/04/2000