Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/07/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/07/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/07/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/07/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/07/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/07/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/09/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/14/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/14/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/14/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/14/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/14/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/14/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/14/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/19/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/19/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/19/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/19/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/19/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/21/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/21/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/21/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/21/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/27/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/27/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/27/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/28/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/10/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/10/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/10/2000