There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress concerning the war crimes committed by the Japanese military during World War II.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/19/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/17/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
06/19/2000Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/19/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/19/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/21/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/22/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/23/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/26/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/28/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/11/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/24/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/26/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/07/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/20/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/20/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/20/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/20/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/20/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/20/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/20/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/25/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/25/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/25/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/28/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/02/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/16/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations06/19/2000 Referred to
House International Relations Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific07/17/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.357.


Subjects (18)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.357. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/19/2000)

Calls upon the Government of Japan to: (1) formally issue an apology for the war crimes committed by the Japanese military during World War II; and (2) pay reparations to the victims.