Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/19/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/21/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/22/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/23/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/26/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/28/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/11/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/24/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/26/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/07/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/20/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/20/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/20/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/20/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/20/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/20/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/20/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/25/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/25/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/25/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/28/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/02/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/16/2000