Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/11/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/26/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/20/2000