Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/19/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/23/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/26/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/28/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/11/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/07/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/20/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/20/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/20/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/20/2000