Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/22/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/22/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/22/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/22/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/28/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/28/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/28/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/28/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/25/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/25/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/27/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/13/2000