Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/29/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/12/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/12/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/12/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/17/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/17/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/17/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/17/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/17/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/17/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/17/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/17/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/25/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/25/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/25/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/25/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/25/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/25/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/25/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/27/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/06/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/06/2000