Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/17/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/17/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/19/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/19/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/20/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/20/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/24/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/24/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/24/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/24/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/26/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/26/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/27/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/06/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/06/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/06/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/06/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/06/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/06/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/13/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/13/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/21/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/25/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/25/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/27/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [R-CA-31] 09/27/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/27/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/05/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/10/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/12/2000