Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/17/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/17/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/17/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/18/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/18/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/18/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/18/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/18/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/18/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/19/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/19/2000
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/24/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/25/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/25/2000