Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/20/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/25/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/18/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/25/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/29/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/29/2000