Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/26/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/14/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/20/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/25/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/28/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/28/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/28/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/02/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/02/2000