Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/18/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/18/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/04/1999