There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress regarding Taiwan's participation in the United Nations.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/19/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10841)
10/03/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8726)
09/06/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
10/20/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/19/2000SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10841)
10/04/2000SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/03/2000-9:05pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/03/2000-9:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/03/2000-9:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8726)
10/03/2000-8:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 390.
10/03/2000-8:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8726-8728)
10/03/2000-8:51pmHouseMr. Rohrabacher moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
09/06/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
09/06/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [R-CA-31]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/06/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/06/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/07/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/07/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/12/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/12/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/12/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/13/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/13/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/13/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/13/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/13/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/13/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/14/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/14/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/19/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/19/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/19/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/26/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/26/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/28/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/28/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations09/06/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.390.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.390. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/03/2000)

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) Taiwan and its people deserve appropriate participation in the United Nations and other international organizations such as the World Health Organization; and (2) the United States should fulfill its commitment made in the 1994 Taiwan Policy Review to support more actively Taiwan's participation in appropriate international organizations.