Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/07/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/19/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/26/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/28/2000