Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/06/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/12/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/13/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/14/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/26/2000