Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/06/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/07/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/12/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/13/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/13/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/14/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/26/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/26/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/26/2000