Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [R-CA-31]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 09/06/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/06/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/07/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/12/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/12/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/13/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/13/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/13/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/13/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/13/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/14/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/19/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/19/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/19/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/26/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/28/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/28/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/28/2000