Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/14/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/14/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/20/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/20/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/20/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/20/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/05/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/05/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/05/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/05/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/05/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/05/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/05/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/05/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/12/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/12/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/12/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/12/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/25/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/02/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/13/2000